|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2147.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2598.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 708.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 414.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|