LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB225
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB225
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB225
Compare Versions
SB225 Chaptered October 6, 2011
SB225 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB225 Amended August 22, 2011
SB225 Amended July 13, 2011
SB225 Amended June 29, 2011
SB225 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB225 Chaptered October 6, 2011
SB225 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB225 Amended August 22, 2011
SB225 Amended July 13, 2011
SB225 Amended June 29, 2011
SB225 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare