|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 2478.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 3222.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3036.)
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 22). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2348.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 654.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 414.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|