LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB226
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB226
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB226
Compare Versions
SB226 Chaptered October 4, 2011
SB226 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB226 Amended September 9, 2011
SB226 Amended September 6, 2011
SB226 Amended September 1, 2011
SB226 Amended August 23, 2011
SB226 Amended August 17, 2011
SB226 Amended July 14, 2011
SB226 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB226 Chaptered October 4, 2011
SB226 Enrolled September 14, 2011
SB226 Amended September 9, 2011
SB226 Amended September 6, 2011
SB226 Amended September 1, 2011
SB226 Amended August 23, 2011
SB226 Amended August 17, 2011
SB226 Amended July 14, 2011
SB226 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare