|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1032.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 643.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|