California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2011

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011