08/16/2012 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/08/2012 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/03/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |||
06/06/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
07/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/13/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/02/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/31/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1114.) (May 26). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 850.) (May 4). | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |