LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB275
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB275
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB275
Compare Versions
SB275 Amended July 3, 2012
SB275 Amended June 6, 2012
SB275 Amended May 31, 2011
SB275 Amended May 11, 2011
SB275 Amended April 25, 2011
SB275 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB275 Amended July 3, 2012
SB275 Amended June 6, 2012
SB275 Amended May 31, 2011
SB275 Amended May 11, 2011
SB275 Amended April 25, 2011
SB275 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare