California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB275 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/14/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 275INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to amend Section 51226 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 275, as introduced, Hancock. Career technical education: assessments. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to coordinate the development, on a cyclical basis, of model curriculum standards for a career technical education course of study necessary to assist school districts with those requirements. Existing law requires the standards for a career technical education course of study to be adopted no later than June 1, 2005. This bill would additionally require the Superintendent to coordinate the development, on a cyclical basis, of assessments for a career technical education course of study necessary to assist school districts with those requirements. The bill would require that these assessments be adopted no later than June 1, 2012. The bill also would make technical, nonsubstantive changes. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51226 of the Education Code is amended to read: 51226. The Superintendent  of Public Instruction  shall coordinate the development, on a cyclical basis, of model curriculum standards for the course of study required by Section 51225.3 and  standards and assessments  for a career technical education course of study necessary to assist school districts with complying with subdivision (b) of Section 51228. The  superintendent   Superintendent  shall set forth these standards  and assessments  in terms of a wide range of specific competencies, including higher level skills, in each academic subject area. The  superintendent   Superintendent  shall review currently available textbooks in conjunction with the curriculum standards  and assessments  . The  superintendent   Superintendent  shall seek the advice of classroom teachers, school administrators, parents, postsecondary educators, and representatives of business and industry in developing these curriculum standards  and assessments  . The  superintendent   Superintendent  shall recommend policies to the  State Board of Education   state board  for consideration and adoption by the  state  board. The  State Board of Education   state board  shall adopt these policies no later than January 1, 1985. However,  neither the superintendent nor the board   the Superintendent or the state board  shall  not  adopt rules or regulations for course content or methods of instruction. The  superintendent   Superintendent  shall, to the extent applicable, incorporate the integration of career technical and academic education into the development of curriculum standards  and assessments  for career technical education courses. The standards for a career technical education course of study shall be adopted no later than June 1, 2005.  The assessments for a career technical education course of study shall be adopted no later than June 1, 2012.