|
02/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1912.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 2335.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 599.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 495.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|