LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB28
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB28
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB28
Compare Versions
SB28 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB28 Amended July 7, 2011
SB28 Amended April 14, 2011
SB28 Amended April 7, 2011
SB28 Amended March 23, 2011
SB28 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB28 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB28 Amended July 7, 2011
SB28 Amended April 14, 2011
SB28 Amended April 7, 2011
SB28 Amended March 23, 2011
SB28 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare