California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 24, 2011