LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB289
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB289
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB289
Compare Versions
SB289 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB289 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB289 Amended August 23, 2012
SB289 Amended August 6, 2012
SB289 Amended June 19, 2012
SB289 Amended January 4, 2012
SB289 Amended March 24, 2011
SB289 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB289 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB289 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB289 Amended August 23, 2012
SB289 Amended August 6, 2012
SB289 Amended June 19, 2012
SB289 Amended January 4, 2012
SB289 Amended March 24, 2011
SB289 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare