|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 700, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2410.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3004.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2814.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 654.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 559.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|