LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB293
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB293
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB293
Compare Versions
SB293 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB293 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB293 Amended September 2, 2011
SB293 Amended August 26, 2011
SB293 Amended August 15, 2011
SB293 Amended July 5, 2011
SB293 Amended June 21, 2011
SB293 Amended June 13, 2011
SB293 Amended June 2, 2011
SB293 Amended March 25, 2011
SB293 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB293 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB293 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB293 Amended September 2, 2011
SB293 Amended August 26, 2011
SB293 Amended August 15, 2011
SB293 Amended July 5, 2011
SB293 Amended June 21, 2011
SB293 Amended June 13, 2011
SB293 Amended June 2, 2011
SB293 Amended March 25, 2011
SB293 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare