|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2000.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 2448.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 643.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|