LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB325
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB325
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB325
Compare Versions
SB325 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB325 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB325 Amended June 9, 2011
SB325 Amended May 11, 2011
SB325 Amended April 26, 2011
SB325 Amended April 4, 2011
SB325 Amended March 21, 2011
SB325 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB325 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB325 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB325 Amended June 9, 2011
SB325 Amended May 11, 2011
SB325 Amended April 26, 2011
SB325 Amended April 4, 2011
SB325 Amended March 21, 2011
SB325 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare