|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 372, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2146.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2577.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2446.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 579.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|