LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB33
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB33
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB33
Compare Versions
SB33 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB33 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB33 Amended August 18, 2011
SB33 Amended June 15, 2011
SB33 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB33 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB33 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB33 Amended August 18, 2011
SB33 Amended June 15, 2011
SB33 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare