|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2268.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 2773.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2684.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2570.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 559.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|