LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB337
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB337
Compare Versions
SB337 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB337 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB337 Amended August 30, 2011
SB337 Amended August 25, 2011
SB337 Amended June 28, 2011
SB337 Amended June 16, 2011
SB337 Amended May 25, 2011
SB337 Amended April 12, 2011
SB337 Amended March 24, 2011
SB337 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB337 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB337 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB337 Amended August 30, 2011
SB337 Amended August 25, 2011
SB337 Amended June 28, 2011
SB337 Amended June 16, 2011
SB337 Amended May 25, 2011
SB337 Amended April 12, 2011
SB337 Amended March 24, 2011
SB337 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare