|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 505, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 5077.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Set for hearing August 30. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 5043.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6347.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6169.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2177.)
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1267.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1111.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 857.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|