LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB35
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB35
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB35
Compare Versions
SB35 Chaptered September 24, 2012
SB35 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB35 Amended August 23, 2012
SB35 Amended August 20, 2012
SB35 Amended August 6, 2012
SB35 Amended June 27, 2012
SB35 Amended June 21, 2012
SB35 Amended July 11, 2011
SB35 Amended June 20, 2011
SB35 Amended May 31, 2011
SB35 Amended April 26, 2011
SB35 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB35 Chaptered September 24, 2012
SB35 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB35 Amended August 23, 2012
SB35 Amended August 20, 2012
SB35 Amended August 6, 2012
SB35 Amended June 27, 2012
SB35 Amended June 21, 2012
SB35 Amended July 11, 2011
SB35 Amended June 20, 2011
SB35 Amended May 31, 2011
SB35 Amended April 26, 2011
SB35 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare