|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3174.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 3218.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Motion to reconsider continued to September 9.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 32. Page 3019.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Monning.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2824.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 16. Page 901.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 846.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 619.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|