California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 5, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011