|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 263, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2454.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 987.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 738.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|