California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB374 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/06/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 374CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 263 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 16, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Strickland FEBRUARY 15, 2011 An act to amend Section 19854 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 374, Strickland. Gambling control: key employee licenses. The Gambling Control Act provides for the licensure of certain individuals and establishments involved in various gambling activities, and for the regulation of those activities, by the California Gambling Control Commission. Existing law requires certain persons employed in the operation of a gambling enterprise, known as key employees, to apply for and obtain a key employee license. A key employee license entitles the holder to work in any key employee position at any gambling establishment, provided that the key employee terminates employment with one gambling establishment before commencing work for another. Existing law requires the commission to establish a program for portable personal licenses for key employees, to be implemented on or before July 1, 2008. This bill would authorize a key employee with a valid personal portable license to work as a key employee in any key employee position in more than one gambling establishment. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19854 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 19854. (a) Every key employee shall apply for and obtain a key employee license. (b) No person may be issued a key employee license unless the person would qualify for a state gambling license. (c) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2), a key employee license shall entitle the holder to work as a key employee in any key employee position at any gambling establishment, provided that the key employee terminates employment with one gambling establishment before commencing work for another. (2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1), a key employee with a valid personal portable license may work as a key employee in any key employee position in more than one gambling establishment. (d) The commission shall establish a program for portable personal licenses for key employees, as well as a process by which valid key employee licenses then in effect shall be converted to personal portable licenses. The commission may, as part of that process, establish a fee to be paid by a key employee when seeking a personal portable license. The commission shall seek to implement the requirements imposed by this subdivision on or before July 1, 2008.