California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 20, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill April 7, 2011
Bill March 23, 2011