LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB380
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB380
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB380
Compare Versions
SB380 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB380 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB380 Amended June 20, 2011
SB380 Amended April 27, 2011
SB380 Amended April 7, 2011
SB380 Amended March 23, 2011
SB380 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB380 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB380 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB380 Amended June 20, 2011
SB380 Amended April 27, 2011
SB380 Amended April 7, 2011
SB380 Amended March 23, 2011
SB380 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare