|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2463.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3115.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2769.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1116.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 860.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|