California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011