California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill August 26, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011