LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB397
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB397
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB397
Compare Versions
SB397 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB397 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB397 Amended August 26, 2011
SB397 Amended August 15, 2011
SB397 Amended May 31, 2011
SB397 Amended May 11, 2011
SB397 Amended April 27, 2011
SB397 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB397 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB397 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB397 Amended August 26, 2011
SB397 Amended August 15, 2011
SB397 Amended May 31, 2011
SB397 Amended May 11, 2011
SB397 Amended April 27, 2011
SB397 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare