|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1914.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2230.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1040.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 948.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|