LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB423
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB423
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB423
Compare Versions
SB423 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB423 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB423 Amended June 30, 2011
SB423 Amended March 23, 2011
SB423 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB423 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB423 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB423 Amended June 30, 2011
SB423 Amended March 23, 2011
SB423 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare