|
07/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2075.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|