LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB424
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB424
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB424
Compare Versions
SB424 Chaptered July 26, 2011
SB424 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SB424 Amended June 21, 2011
SB424 Amended April 26, 2011
SB424 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB424 Chaptered July 26, 2011
SB424 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SB424 Amended June 21, 2011
SB424 Amended April 26, 2011
SB424 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare