|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 304, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2144.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2508.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2450.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1116.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 862.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|