LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB428
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB428
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB428
Compare Versions
SB428 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SB428 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB428 Amended August 18, 2011
SB428 Amended June 27, 2011
SB428 Amended May 31, 2011
SB428 Amended May 17, 2011
SB428 Amended April 27, 2011
SB428 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB428 Chaptered September 21, 2011
SB428 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB428 Amended August 18, 2011
SB428 Amended June 27, 2011
SB428 Amended May 31, 2011
SB428 Amended May 17, 2011
SB428 Amended April 27, 2011
SB428 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare