California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB429 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 26, 2011
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill June 13, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011