LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB429
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB429
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB429
Compare Versions
SB429 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB429 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB429 Amended September 1, 2011
SB429 Amended August 26, 2011
SB429 Amended June 29, 2011
SB429 Amended June 13, 2011
SB429 Amended April 26, 2011
SB429 Amended April 4, 2011
SB429 Amended March 21, 2011
SB429 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB429 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB429 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB429 Amended September 1, 2011
SB429 Amended August 26, 2011
SB429 Amended June 29, 2011
SB429 Amended June 13, 2011
SB429 Amended April 26, 2011
SB429 Amended April 4, 2011
SB429 Amended March 21, 2011
SB429 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare