|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
(Enrolled measure version corrected)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 2732.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 596.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 541.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|