California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB441 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/07/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 441CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 563 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 7, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 7, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 12, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Vargas FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to repeal Section 13305 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 441, Vargas. Elections: contributions. Existing law permits the county central committee of each qualified political party to supply county elections officials with party contribution envelopes or letters, as specified, to be included with the mailing of the sample ballot to each of the registered voters who disclosed preference for that same political party on the voter's affidavit of registration. This bill would repeal these provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13305 of the Elections Code is repealed.