|
02/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1974.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2388.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2330.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 853.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|