California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB448 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/19/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 448ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 14, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 26, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senators DeSaulnier and Hancock FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to add Section 101.5 to the Elections Code, relating to voting. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 448, DeSaulnier. Elections. Existing law requires that any state or local initiative petition contain a statement, as described, notifying the public that the petition may be circulated by either a paid or a volunteer signature gatherer, and that the public has the right to ask. This bill would require an individual who receives compensation to circulate an initiative, referendum, or recall petition to wear a badge stating, in no smaller than 30-point font print, that he or she is a "paid signature gatherer." The bill would require the individual circulating the initiative, referendum, or recall petition to wear the badge on his or her chest in clear view of all individuals signing or asked to sign the petition. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 101.5 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 101.5. (a) An individual who receives compensation to circulate an initiative, referendum, or recall petition shall identify himself or herself as a paid signature gatherer by wearing a badge stating "PAID SIGNATURE GATHERER." (b) The individual circulating an initiative, referendum, or recall petition shall wear the badge required by subdivision (a) on his or her chest in clear view of all individuals signing or asked to sign the petition. (c) The print on the badge shall be no smaller than 30-point font.