|
06/29/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1227.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 558.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|