LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB449
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB449
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB449
Compare Versions
SB449 Amended June 20, 2011
SB449 Amended May 19, 2011
SB449 Amended May 17, 2011
SB449 Amended April 26, 2011
SB449 Amended April 25, 2011
SB449 Amended April 7, 2011
SB449 Amended March 30, 2011
SB449 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB449 Amended June 20, 2011
SB449 Amended May 19, 2011
SB449 Amended May 17, 2011
SB449 Amended April 26, 2011
SB449 Amended April 25, 2011
SB449 Amended April 7, 2011
SB449 Amended March 30, 2011
SB449 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare