|
08/27/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 6087.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 3. Page 2733.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2686.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|