LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB455
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB455
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB455
Compare Versions
SB455 Amended August 22, 2012
SB455 Amended August 13, 2012
SB455 Amended August 7, 2012
SB455 Amended June 11, 2012
SB455 Amended January 25, 2012
SB455 Amended January 4, 2012
SB455 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB455 Amended August 22, 2012
SB455 Amended August 13, 2012
SB455 Amended August 7, 2012
SB455 Amended June 11, 2012
SB455 Amended January 25, 2012
SB455 Amended January 4, 2012
SB455 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare