|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2238.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2751.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 542.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|